EP0894942 - Gas Turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Takashi 1-2-48-402, Kajiyama, Tsurumi-Ku Yokohama-Shi, Kanagawa-Ken / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/05] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114234.2 | 29.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | JP19970206631 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: JP 20663197 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894942 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894942 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894942 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/08, F02C7/18, F01D25/12 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
F01D11/02 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (KR);
F01D5/00 (EP,US);
F01D5/08 (EP,KR,US);
F01D5/081 (EP,US);
F01D5/084 (EP,US);
F01D5/085 (EP,US);
F02C3/30 (KR);
F02C7/06 (KR);
F02C7/16 (KR);
F02C7/18 (EP,US);
F05D2260/205 (EP,US);
F05D2300/21 (EP,US);
F05D2300/2261 (EP,US);
F05D2300/5024 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/05] | F01D5/08, F02C7/18 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [2001/24] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gasturbine | [1999/05] | English: | Gas Turbine | [1999/05] | French: | Turbine à gaz | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04022075.8 / EP1486643 | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH09195702 ; | US5695319 [ ] (MATSUMOTO MANABU [JP], et al) [ ] * column 8, line 45 - line 55 * * column 12, line 33 - column 13, line 26 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9702436 (ABB CARBON AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 6, line 14 - line 28 * * page 7, line 1 - line 16 * * claim 2 *; | [Y]JPS57208319 ; | [A]NL65742C (N.V. DE BATAAFSCHE PETROLEUM MAATSCHAPPIJ) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 56 - page 2, line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB957616 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 33 - line 54 * * page 1, line 84 - page 2, line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2860851 (BERNARD HALFORD FRANK, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 2 - line 19 * * claim 5 *; | [Y]CH322772 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [Y] 6 * page 1, line 57 - page 2, line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2173489 (RUDOLF VOIGT) [Y] 6 * page 2, column L, line 32 - column R, line 8 * * figure 5 *; | [A]FR574739 (BROWN) [A] 6 * page 2, column L, line 26 - column R, line 1 * * figure 1 * * claims 1,5 *; | [Y]US5054583 (WRZYSZCZYNSKI JACK A [US]) [Y] 1,7 * column 4, line 2 - line 21 * * column 5, line 12 - line 15 * * figures 1,2 * * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]JPH03253726 ; | [E]WO9900583 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [E] 8 * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US2893703 (ADAMS RICHARDSON EDWARD) [Y] 13 * column 4, line 23 - line 36 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3556676 (GORBUNOV IGOR KONSTANTINOVICH, et al) [A] 13 * column 2, line 31 - line 49 * * figure 1 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09195702 A 19970729 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-5,7,8,11,13 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830316), vol. 007, no. 063, Database accession no. (M - 200), & JP57208319 A 19821221 (SONY KK) [Y] 1,5 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920210), vol. 016, no. 051, Database accession no. (M - 1209), & JP03253726 A 19911112 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 8,11 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0277725 |