EP0894769 - Apparatus for releasing carbon dioxide into drinking water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wintner, Eduard Goethestrasse 11 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [1999/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul Norbert, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Torggler, Paul Norbert, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Torggler und Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6021 Innsbruck / AT | ||
Former [1999/05] | Torggler, Paul, Dr., et al Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 98114406.6 | 31.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | AT19970001307 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: AT 130797 | [1999/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894769 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894769 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/68 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
C02F1/68 (EP);
B01F23/2361 (EP);
B01F23/237621 (EP);
B01F2101/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/13] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einbringen von Kohlendioxid in Trinkwasser | [1999/05] | English: | Apparatus for releasing carbon dioxide into drinking water | [1999/05] | French: | Dispositif de libération de dioxide de carbon dans l'eau potable | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/31] | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.02.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8604785 (MICALLEF PAUL ALFRED, et al) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 11 - page 8, line 6; figures 1,6 *; | [A]US4940212 (BURTON JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0472995 (SODA CLUB HOLDINGS NV [NL]); | [A]US4395940 (CHILD ROBERT P [GB], et al); | [A]US5396934 (MOENCH THOMAS S [US]) |