EP0895841 - Device for making large sizes blocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bisotherm GmbH Eisenbahnstrasse 12 56218 Mülheim-Kärlich / DE | [1999/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jachmich, Wolfgang Vier Windenhöhe 44 56170 Bendorf / DE | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114478.5 | 31.07.1998 | [1999/06] | Priority number, date | DE1997213893U | 04.08.1997 Original published format: DE 29713893 U | [1999/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895841 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/00 | [1999/06] | CPC: |
B28B7/0079 (EP);
B28B7/0044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, LU, NL [1999/42] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Grossblöcken | [1999/06] | English: | Device for making large sizes blocks | [1999/06] | French: | Dispositif pour la fabrication de blocs de grandes dimensions | [1999/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 11.08.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, MC, PT, SE | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/09] | 20.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.09.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB191209783 (W. SMITH) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [X]GB334882 (H. BRUNT) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3505465 (GRAUCOB HEINRICH) [Y] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3694128 (FOXEN BENJAMIN F) [Y] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR1556792 (F. NOIREL) [Y] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]NL76778C (J. P. HINTZBERGEN) [Y] 1,2,5 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB2277541 (INAX CORP) [A] 1-3,5,6 * figures 6,7,11 *; | [A]US3918877 (PICKETT WILLIAM H) [A] 1,3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US1567243 (H. E. CLOUSER) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US1584920 (W. A. FLINT) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19546886 (RAMPF FORMEN GMBH) [A] 1,3,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE400110 (C. NINGELGEN) [A] 1,3,7 * the whole document * |