EP0894568 - Method and apparatus for grinding eyeglass lenses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nidek Co., Ltd. 7-9, Sakae-cho Gamagori-shi Aichi / JP | [2008/37] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states Nidek Co., Ltd. 7-9, Sakae-cho Gamagori-shi, Aichi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibata, Ryoji 68, Daida-cho 1-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Weber, Joachim, Dr. Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114485.0 | 31.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | JP19970220924 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22092497 | JP19980125444 | 31.03.1998 Original published format: JP 12544498 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0894568 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0894568 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0894568 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B24B9/14, B24B47/22, B24B49/02, B24B51/00 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
B24B9/148 (EP,US);
B24B47/225 (EP,US);
B24B49/02 (EP,US);
B24B51/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2001/04] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schleifen von Brillengläsern | [1999/05] | English: | Method and apparatus for grinding eyeglass lenses | [1999/05] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour meuler des verres de lunettes | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 14.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.09.2007 | 06.08.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08006748.1 / EP1938923 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0802020 (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-11,14,17-19 * column 10, line 28 - column 11, line 4 * * column 13, line 32 - column 14, line 37 * * column 21, line 46 - column 22, line 53; figures 7A-8B,10-14 *; | [XA]EP0196114 (TOKYO OPTICAL [JP]) [X] 1,2,9,17,18 * abstract * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 22 * * page 9, line 8 - line 14 * * page 16, line 11 - page 19, line 22 * [A] 10-16; | [AD]US5347762 (SHIBATA RYOJI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-8,17,18 * the whole document * | Examination | US5148637 |