EP0897967 - Process and apparatus for gasifying waste materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LINDE-KCA-Dresden GmbH Wilsdruffer Strasse 27 01067 Dresden / DE | [1999/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marschner, Siegmar, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Schützenhofstrasse 143 01129 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Halang, Sven, Dipl.-Ing. Merbachstrasse 5 09599 Freiberg / DE | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114660.8 | 04.08.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | DE1997135153 | 13.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19735153 | [1999/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0897967 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0897967 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/57 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
C10J3/57 (EP,US);
C10K1/026 (EP,US);
C10J2200/152 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0946 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0993 (EP,US);
C10J2300/0996 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1223 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1634 (EP,US);
Y10S266/90 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/49] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Vergasung von Abfallstoffen | [1999/08] | English: | Process and apparatus for gasifying waste materials | [1999/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour gazéifier des déchets | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 12.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 01.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1287724 (RUMMEL ROMAN) [A] 1,11* column 4, line 25 - column 7, line 6 *; | [A]DE2552077 (OTTO & CO GMBH DR C) [A] 1,11,12 * pages 1-2; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0175207 (DORNIER SYSTEM GMBH [DE]) [A] 2,6,8 * page 9, line 12 - page 11, line 18 *; | [A]DE4109063 (DEUTSCHES BRENNSTOFFINST [DE]) [A] 2,4,5,8,9,12-14 * column 4, line 45 - column 7, line 9 *; | [XP]DE19629544 (LINDE KCA DRESDEN GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1,3,4,6-9,11 * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 32 * |