EP0899148 - Method and device for determining a basis object of a regulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmeyer, Andreas Asternweg 8 61350 Bad Homburg / DE | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/20] |
Former [1999/09] | Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys. Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 98114852.1 | 07.08.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | DE1997136966 | 25.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19736966 | [1999/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899148 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899148 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/00, G01S13/93 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
B60W30/16 (EP);
B60K31/0008 (EP);
B60K31/0066 (EP);
B60W30/18145 (EP);
G01S13/931 (EP);
B60W2520/14 (EP);
B60W2520/28 (EP);
G01S2013/9319 (EP);
G01S2013/932 (EP);
G01S2013/9321 (EP);
G01S2013/9323 (EP);
G01S2013/9325 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2001/50] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Bestimmung eines Regelobjekts | [1999/09] | English: | Method and device for determining a basis object of a regulation | [1999/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détermination d'un objet de base d'un asservissement | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/35] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4342257 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 8 * page 4, line 27 - line 29 * [A] 1; | [A] - WINNER ET AL, "Adaptive Cruise Control System Aspects and Development Trends", SAE TRANSACTIONS,SOCIETY OF AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERS, INC., WARRENDALE, PA,US, (1996), vol. 105, no. 961010, ISSN 0096-736X, pages 1412 - 1421, XP002124577 [A] 1,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4271/961010 |