EP0980191 - PNNI topology abstraction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | ||
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iliadis, Ilias Schloss-Strasse 29 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | 02 /
Scotton, Paolo Turnhallenweg 3 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Michael Josef IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Meyer, Michael Josef IBM Research GmbH Zurich Research Laboratory Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [2000/40] | Williams, Julian David International Business Machines Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [2000/07] | Heusch, Christian International Business Machines Corporation, Saümerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 98114966.9 | 10.08.1998 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980191 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980191 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/56 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5621 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/43] |
Former [2000/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abstraktion einer "PNNI" Topologie | [2000/07] | English: | PNNI topology abstraction | [2000/07] | French: | Abstraction d' une topologie "PNNI" | [2008/50] |
Former [2000/07] | Abstraction de ca topologie "PNNI" | Examination procedure | 10.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 25.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0781007 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * page 3, line 3 - line 54 *; | [A] - IWATA A ET AL, "ATM ROUTING ALGORTHMS WITH MULTIPLE QOS REQUIREMENTS FOR MULTIMEDIA INTERNETWORKING", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (199608), vol. E79-B, no. 8, pages 999 - 1007, XP000628636 [A] 1-18 * paragraph [02.2]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [03.4] * | [A] - VENKATESWARAN R ET AL, "HIERARCHICAL MULTICAST ROUTING IN ATM NETWORKS", 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC), CONVERGING TECHNOLOGIES FOR TOMORROW'S APPLICATIONS DALLAS, JUNE 23 - 27, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL & ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19960623), vol. 3, pages 1690 - 1694, XP000625096 [A] 1,10,15 * abstract * | [A] - JUHRO TAKASE, "A CHARACTERISTIC OF PRIMARY DISTRIBUTED-TYPE SWITCHING NETWORK", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, (19920901), vol. 75, no. 9, pages 1 - 14, XP000354934 [A] 1,10,15 * paragraph [0001] * | [A] - DIMITRIJEVIC D D ET AL, "ROUTING IN MULTIPLE DOMAIN NETWORKS", TECHNOLOGY: EMERGING OR CONVERGING?, OTTAWA, APRIL 23 - 27, 1989, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19890423), vol. 3, no. CONF. 8, pages 1047 - 1056, XP000076759 [A] 1,10,15 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0781007 |