EP0897172 - Display device for informations and their use and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2001 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vossloh Systemelektronik GmbH Dieselstrasse 8 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Vossloh Systemelektronik GmbH Dieselstrasse 8 85751 Karlsfeld / DE | ||
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states Vossloh MAN Systemelektronik GmbH Dieselstrasse 8 85751 Karlsfeld / DE | ||
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states MAN Technologie AG Stadtbachstrasse 1 86153 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malcherek, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Dr.-Engert-Strasse 1 85221 Dachau / DE | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Grape, Knut, et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | Grape, Knut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115077.4 | 11.08.1998 | [1999/07] | Priority number, date | DE1997134792 | 11.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19734792 | DE1997138972 | 05.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19738972 | [1999/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0897172 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0897172 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/33 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
H01L25/13 (EP);
G09F9/33 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2000/33] |
Former [1999/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Displayanordnung zum Anzeigen von Informationen und deren Verwendung sowie ein Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1999/07] | English: | Display device for informations and their use and method of manufacture | [1999/07] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage pour informations et pour leur utilisation et methode de fabrication | [1999/07] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 09.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.07.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, IT, LU, NL, SE | 28.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/25] | 23.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2434447 (CHICAGO MINIATURE LAMP WORKS) [X] 1,2,4,6,14,17,18,25 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9518435 (ROSENITSCH HARALD) [X] 1 * page 2, lines 9-25; figure 4 *; | [X]EP0400176 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]GB2265998 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3513557 (LUMINO GMBH LICHT ELEKTRONIK) [A] 24 * abstract * |