EP0897836 - Safety device for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA (EUROPE) VEHICLE SAFETY TECHNOLOGY GmbH Lise-Meitner-Strasse 3, Science Park II 89081 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states TAKATA (EUROPE) VEHICLE SAFETY TECHNOLOGY GmbH Lise-Meitner-Strasse 3, Science Park II 89081 Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heudorfer, Benedikt Silcherstrasse 10 89278 Nersingen / DE | 02 /
Glöckler, Oliver Industrieweg 1 89197 Weidenstetten / DE | 03 /
Einsiedel, Heinrich Ensingerstrasse 19 89073 Ulm / DE | [1999/08] | Representative(s) | Finsterwald, Martin, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Finsterwald, Martin, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/08] | Finsterwald, Martin, Dr., et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR, Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115176.4 | 12.08.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | DE1997136200 | 20.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19736200 | [1999/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0897836 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
B60R21/2338 (EP);
B60R21/232 (EP);
B60R21/26 (EP);
B60R22/1953 (EP);
B60R2021/23192 (EP);
B60R2021/23382 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/44] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [1999/08] | English: | Safety device for a vehicle | [1999/08] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité pour un véhicule | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/19] | 17.12.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.10.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.10.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]DE19726782 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [PX] 1,10 * column 7, line 43 - column 19, line 17; figures 1-18 *; | [A]DE19519297 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 44; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9309977 (SIEMENS AG ;DYNAMIT NOBEL AG (DE); KOLBENSCHMIDT AG (DE)) [A] 1,10 * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line L; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE4238427 (TAKATA CORP) [A] 1,10 * column 6, line 13 - column 7, line 15; figures 9-12 * |