EP0898003 - Multifunction control device for washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2010/42] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/23] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hegewald, Ronald, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Untere Hammerwiese 12 93164 Laaber / DE | 02 /
Liebl, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Am Kobel 4 a 93128 Regenstauf / DE | [1999/08] | Application number, filing date | 98115178.0 | 12.08.1998 | [1999/08] | Priority number, date | DE19972014901U | 21.08.1997 Original published format: DE 29714901 U | [1999/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0898003 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0898003 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0898003 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0898003 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00 | [1999/08] | CPC: |
D06F34/32 (EP,US);
D06F2101/10 (EP,US);
D06F2101/14 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/48] |
Former [1999/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Multifunktions-Bedienvorrichtung für Waschmaschinen | [1999/08] | English: | Multifunction control device for washing machine | [1999/08] | French: | Dispositif de commande multifonction pour machine à laver | [1999/08] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 17.01.2001 | Observations by third parties | 13.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2004 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2004
13.05.2004
ADMISSIBLE AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhofer Strasse 135 D-90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Blaumeier, Jörg, et al, et al Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | 02
05.05.2004
13.05.2004
ADMISSIBLE Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Str. 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2004
13.05.2004
ADMISSIBLE AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhofer Strasse 135 D-90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Blaumeier, Jörg, et al, et al LINDNER BLAUMEIER & KOLLEGEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 119109 90101 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
05.05.2004
13.05.2004
ADMISSIBLE Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Str. 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | |||
Former [2004/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2004
AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhofer Strasse 135 D-90429 Nürnberg / DE Opponent's representative Matschkur, Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, et al, et al Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
05.05.2004
ADMISSIBLE Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Str. 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | 11.06.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.10.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.09.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.09.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 01.09.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 22.01.2007 | Appeal received No. T0129/07 | 30.03.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.09.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 11.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.09.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | [2015/21] |
Former [2010/28] | CH | 31.08.2009 | |
LI | 31.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2450305 (MARTIN USINES FONDERIES ARTHUR) [A] 1,12,14-16 * page 2, line 29 - line 38 * * page 4, line 32 - line 41; figure .; claim - *; | [A]JPH07163787 ; | [A]JPH07275566 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07163787 A 19950627 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 096, no. 002, & JP07275566 A 19951024 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | DE3527968 | DE3836555 | DE3821004 | DE29604717U | other | KR0159116B | JPH07163787 | Opposition | DE2806150 | DE19606115 | KR0159116B | DE4004097 | US5279134 | DE3339796 | DE3533034 |