EP0913127 - Device for elimination of hairs and/or atrophying hair follicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/18] | Device for elementation of hairs and/or atrophying hair follicles | ||
[1999/42] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, FR, GB | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etoile S.n.c. Via Grandi 9 20060 Robbiano di Mediglia / IT | For all designated states EL.EN. S.p.A. Via Giovanni da San Giovanni, 10 50100 Firenze / IT | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lazzari, Ambrogio Via Grandi 9 20060 Robbiano di Mediglia / IT | 02 /
Clementi, Gabriele Via L. Bardelli 27 50139 Firenze / IT | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bachstrasse 6 A 84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115299.4 | 14.08.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | IT1997BO00579 | 26.09.1997 Original published format: IT BO970579 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913127 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0913127 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913127 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0913127 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/20 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
A61B18/203 (EP);
A61B18/20 (EP);
A61B2018/00452 (EP);
A61B2018/00476 (EP);
A61B2018/00904 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/18] | A61B17/41 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] |
Former [2000/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI | ||
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 18.05.1999 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Haaren und/oder zum Atrophieren der Haarfollikel | [1999/18] | English: | Device for elimination of hairs and/or atrophying hair follicles | [1999/42] | French: | Dispositif pour l'épilation et/ou pour atrophier les follicules pileux | [1999/18] |
Former [1999/18] | Device for elementation of hairs and/or atrophying hair follicles | Examination procedure | 11.03.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 19.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.10.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.11.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, IE, LU, MC | 18.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2001
18.03.2004
WITHDRAWN IONTO-COMED GmbH Boschstrasse 5 76334 Eggenstein-Leopoldstein / DE Opponent's representative Durm, Frank Durm & Partner Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | 02
05.06.2001
26.06.2001
ADMISSIBLE BIOS S.r.l. Via Pisa 61 COLOGNO MONZESE (MILAN) / IT Opponent's representative Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2001
18.03.2004
WITHDRAWN IONTO-COMED GmbH Boschstrasse 5 76334 Eggenstein-Leopoldstein / DE Opponent's representative Durm, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. Durm & Durm Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02
05.06.2001
26.06.2001
ADMISSIBLE BIOS S.r.l. Via Pisa 61 COLOGNO MONZESE (MILAN) / IT Opponent's representative Crippa, Paolo Ernesto, et al, et al JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.p.A. Piazzale Arnaldo, 2 25121 Brescia / IT | |||
Former [2004/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2001
18.03.2004
WITHDRAWN IONTO-COMED GmbH Boschstrasse 5 76334 Eggenstein-Leopoldstein / DE Opponent's representative Durm, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. Durm & Durm Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02
05.06.2001
26.06.2001
ADMISSIBLE BIOS S.r.l. Via Pisa 61 COLOGNO MONZESE (MILAN) / IT Opponent's representative Manzoni, Alessandro MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2 25121 Brescia / IT | |||
Former [2002/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2001
15.06.2001
ADMISSIBLE IONTO-COMED GmbH Boschstrasse 5 76334 Eggenstein-Leopoldstein / DE Opponent's representative Durm, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. Durm & Durm Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
02
05.06.2001
26.06.2001
ADMISSIBLE BIOS S.r.l. Via Pisa 61 COLOGNO MONZESE (MILAN) / IT Opponent's representative Manzoni, Alessandro MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2 25121 Brescia / IT | |||
Former [2001/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2001
15.06.2001
ADMISSIBLE IONTO-COMED GmbH Boschstrasse 5 76334 Eggenstein-Leopoldstein / DE Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
02
05.06.2001
26.06.2001
ADMISSIBLE BIOS S.r.l. Via Pisa 61 COLOGNO MONZESE (MILAN) / IT Opponent's representative Manzoni, Alessandro MANZONI & MANZONI, UFFICIO INTERNAZIONALE BREVETTI, P.le Arnaldo 2 25121 Brescia / IT | |||
Former [2001/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.05.2001
15.06.2001
ADMISSIBLE IONTO-COMED GmbH Boschstrasse 5 76334 Eggenstein-Leopoldstein / DE Opponent's representative Becker, Thomas, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | 18.07.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.05.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.01.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.03.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.02.2006 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.05.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.04.2004 | Appeal received No. T0511/04 | 12.07.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.02.2006 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 23.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.03.2006 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.02.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.09.2000 | AT | 14.08.2002 | SE | 15.08.2002 | CH | 31.08.2002 | LI | 31.08.2002 | PT | 28.02.2003 | NL | 01.03.2003 | GB | 14.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | DE | 01.03.2006 | GR | 02.03.2006 | FR | 28.04.2006 | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/38] | AT | 14.08.2002 | |
SE | 15.08.2002 | ||
CH | 31.08.2002 | ||
LI | 31.08.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2003 | ||
NL | 01.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
GR | 02.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 14.08.2002 | |
SE | 15.08.2002 | ||
CH | 31.08.2002 | ||
LI | 31.08.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2003 | ||
NL | 01.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2003/39] | AT | 14.08.2002 | |
SE | 15.08.2002 | ||
CH | 31.08.2002 | ||
LI | 31.08.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2003 | ||
NL | 01.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 14.08.2002 | |
SE | 15.08.2002 | ||
PT | 28.02.2003 | ||
NL | 01.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 15.08.2002 | |
PT | 28.02.2003 | ||
NL | 01.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | SE | 15.08.2002 | |
PT | 28.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 15.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9106406 (SIMON PAL [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5065515 (IDEROSA RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5632741 (ZAVISLAN JAMES M [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract * | Examination | US4905670 | EP0438353 | US5562842 | - EUROPEAN NORM EN 60601-2-22 | - Review "DENTAL CADMOS" | - Review "LASERS" | - Data sheet "ETOILE" |