EP0901940 - Process for producing of an airbag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA (EUROPE) VEHICLE SAFETY TECHNOLOGY GmbH Lise-Meitner-Strasse 3, Science Park II 89081 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states TAKATA (EUROPE) VEHICLE SAFETY TECHNOLOGY GmbH Lise-Meitner-Strasse 3, Science Park II 89081 Ulm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heudorfer, Benedikt Silcherstrasse 10 89278 Nersingen / DE | 02 /
Glöckler, Oliver Schwabenstrasse 3a 89278 Nehrsingen / DE | 03 /
Einsiedel, Heinrich Ensingerstrasse 19 89073 Ulm / DE | 04 /
Klaiber, Uwe Regerstrasse 10 89518 Heidenheim / DE | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Xantener Strasse 10 10707 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1999/11] | Finsterwald, Martin, Dr., et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR, Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115347.1 | 14.08.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | DE1997139558 | 09.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19739558 | [1999/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0901940 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0901940 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
B60R21/235 (EP,US);
B60R21/2338 (EP,US);
D03D1/02 (EP,US);
D03D15/283 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23316 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23382 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23514 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2359 (EP,US);
D10B2331/02 (EP,US);
D10B2331/04 (EP,US);
D10B2401/063 (EP,US);
D10B2505/124 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2001/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Luftsacks | [1999/11] | English: | Process for producing of an airbag | [1999/11] | French: | Procédé de production d'un sac gonflable | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 19.11.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1340549 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 125 - page 3, line 18; figure 8 *; | [A]GB2252983 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 14 - line 17 * * page 3, line 10 - line 13; figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US5538280 (GRAY KEITH N [US], et al) [A] 7,10 * abstract *; | [A]DE19505507 (PETRI AG NIEDERLASSUNG BERLIN [DE]); | [X]US5630620 (HIRAI KINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 49 - line 63 * * column 3, line 19 - line 33 * * column 4, line 9 - line 21; figures 2,3,5 * * abstract * |