EP0903315 - Stairlift for persons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamm, Wilfried Im Wiesengrund 28 D-45481 Mülheim-Ruhr / DE | [1999/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115433.9 | 17.08.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | DE1997140854 | 17.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19740854 | [1999/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903315 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903315 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP0903315 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B66B9/08 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
B66B9/0861 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2001/36] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Personenlift für Treppen | [1999/12] | English: | Stairlift for persons | [1999/12] | French: | Ascenseur d'escalier pour personne | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 21.06.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 09.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE7713249U (SANITÄTSHAUS ARTHUR WOLFF) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 27 - page 4, line 32 * * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 2 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 5,7; | [Y]DE3627975 (GUNTERSDORFER MAX DR) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 21 - line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO9615974 (LAMMERS EVERT JAN ;TRAPLIFT B V (NL)) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, line 9 - line 11 * * page 3, line 14 - line 28 * * page 4, line 8 - line 18 *; | [A]US4306634 (SANGSTER GEORGE G) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0826627 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08026627 A 19960130 (SHUICHIRO SHIMOMURA) [A] 4,6 * abstract * |