EP0902481 - Fabrication method for thin film transistor with reduced parasitic capacitance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/11] | Thin film transistor with reduced parasitic capacitance | ||
[2007/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [2007/39] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mei, Ping 4276 Wilke Way, Apt. D Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 02 /
Lujan, Rene A. 115 West Duane Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 03 /
Boyce, James B. 1036 Russel Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 04 /
Chua, Christopher L. 234 Escuela Ave, Apt. 110 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 05 /
Hack, Michael G. 372, Mountain View Avenue Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115454.5 | 17.08.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | US19970927023 | 10.09.1997 Original published format: US 927023 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0902481 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0902481 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902481 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/786, H01L21/336, H01L21/223, C30B31/08, H01L27/146, G02F1/136, H01L31/0216 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
H01L29/78696 (EP,US);
H01L21/223 (EP,US);
H01L21/2236 (EP,US);
H01L21/2254 (EP,US);
H01L21/2255 (EP,US);
H01L21/266 (EP,US);
H01L27/1443 (EP,US);
H01L27/14603 (EP,US);
H01L29/66757 (EP,US);
H01L29/66765 (EP,US);
H01L29/78669 (EP,US);
H01L31/02162 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/11] | H01L29/786, H01L21/336, H01L21/223, C30B31/08, H01L27/146, G02F1/136 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/09] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für Dünnschichtfeldeffekttransistor mit verminderter Streukapazität | [2007/17] | English: | Fabrication method for thin film transistor with reduced parasitic capacitance | [2007/17] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un transistor à couches minces ayant une capacité parasite réduite | [2007/17] |
Former [1999/11] | Dünnschichtfeldeffekttransistor mit verminderter Streukapazität | ||
Former [1999/11] | Thin film transistor with reduced parasitic capacitance | ||
Former [1999/11] | Transistor à couches minces ayant une capacité parasite réduite | Examination procedure | 21.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 24.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2007 | 13.03.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS61187369 ; | [XA]JPS62205664 ; | [XA]JPS62120075 ; | [X]EP0766294 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-5 * figures 34,69 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870117), vol. 011, no. 017, Database accession no. (E - 471), & JP61187369 A 19860821 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6-10 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880225), vol. 012, no. 063, Database accession no. (E - 585), & JP62205664 A 19870910 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6-10 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871107), vol. 011, no. 341, Database accession no. (E - 554), & JP62120075 A 19870601 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6-10 |