EP0883094 - Method and apparatus for currency discrimination and counting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cummins-Allison Corp. 891, Freehanville Drive Mount Prospect Illinois 60056 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states CUMMINS-ALLISON CORPORATION 891, Freehanville Drive Mount Prospect, Illinois 60056 / US | ||
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states CUMMINS-ALLISON CORPORATION 891, Feehanville Drive Mount Prospect Illinois 60056 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raterman, Donald E. 1345 Carol Lane Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | 02 /
Graves, Bradford T. 3952 Newport Way Arlington Heights, IL 60005 / US | [1999/18] |
Former [1998/50] | 01 /
Raterman, Donald E. 1345 Carol Lane Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | ||
02 /
Graves, Bradford T. 4173 Bloomington Avenue Arlington Heights, Illinois 60004 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115458.6 | 14.01.1991 | [1998/50] | Priority number, date | US19900475111 | 05.02.1990 Original published format: US 475111 | [1998/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0883094 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0883094 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/00 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
G07D7/128 (EP);
G07D11/50 (EP);
G07D7/12 (EP);
G07D7/1205 (EP);
G07D7/16 (EP);
G07D7/162 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum erkennen und zählen von verschiedenen währungen | [1998/50] | English: | Method and apparatus for currency discrimination and counting | [1998/50] | French: | Méthode et appareillage permettant d'identifier et de compter des billets dans diverses monnaies | [1998/50] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.11.2008 | 09.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/10] | 25.10.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 04.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91903057.7 / EP0466869 | EP95116745.1 / EP0706156 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.1999 | 01.02.2000 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0338123 (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0077464 (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0342647 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 41 - column 6, line 28 *; | [XAY]EP0264125 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 14,15 * column 9, line 30 - line 49 * * column 5, line 10 - line 34 * * sentence 40 - sentence 48 * * column 7, line 26 - line 45 * * column 10, line 34 - line 36 * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 1; claim 18 * [A] 16 [Y] 17,18; | [Y]EP0253935 (LIGHT SIGNATURES INC [US]) [Y] 17,18 * abstract * |