EP0953560 - Method, catalyst and apparatus for producing acetaldehyde from acetic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY P.O. Box 511 Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY P.O. Box 511 Kingsport, Tennessee 37662-5075 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tustin, Gerald C. c/o Eastman Chemical Company, P.O. Box 511 Kingsport, TN 37662-5072 / US | 02 /
Depew, Leslie S. c/o Eastman Chemical Company, P.O. Box 511 Kingsport, TN 37662-5072 / US | 03 /
Collins, Nick A. c/o Eastman Chemical Company, P.O. Box 511 Kingsport, TN 37662-5072 / US | [1999/44] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/44] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte, Kindermann Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115520.3 | 18.08.1998 | [1999/44] | Priority number, date | US19980069953 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: US 69953 | [1999/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0953560 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0953560 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/41, C07C47/06, B01J23/74, B01J23/76 | [1999/44] | CPC: |
B01J23/8906 (EP,US);
C07C45/41 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/41, C07C47/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/28] |
Former [1999/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren, Katalysator und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Acetaldehyd aus Essigsäure | [1999/44] | English: | Method, catalyst and apparatus for producing acetaldehyde from acetic acid | [1999/44] | French: | Méthode, catalyseur et appareil pour la production d'acetaldéhyde à partir de l'acide acetique | [1999/44] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09100254 ; | [X]WO9618458 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [X] 24,27 * page 2 - page 4; claims 1,5 *; | [A] - R. PESTMAN ET AL, "Identification of the active sites in the selective hydrogenation of acetic acid to aldehyde on iron oxide catalysts", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (19980319), vol. 174, pages 142 - 152, XP002090057 [A] 1-19,24-27 * page 142; figures 1,2,6,8 * * page 149, column R - page 150, column L * * page 151, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jcat.1998.1957 | [A] - R. PESTMAN ET AL, "Reactions of carboxylic acids on oxides", JOURNAL OF CATALYSIS, (1997), vol. 168, pages 255 - 264, XP002090058 [A] 1-19,24-27 * page 255 - page 256; figure 3 * * page 258, column R; figures 10,11 * * page 261, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jcat.1997.1623 | [X] - S.N. PAVLOVA ET AL, "Low-temperature CO oxidation on iron oxide supported palladium", REACT. KINET. CATAL. LETT., (1996), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 103 - 11, XP002090059 [X] 24-27 * page 103 - page 105; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02067998 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 25, Database accession no. 97-276700, XP002097639 & JPH09100254 A 19970415 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 20-23 * abstract * | [X] - LEVUSH, S. S. ET AL, "Study of the feasibility of dehydration of a reaction mixture during production of acetic anhydride by oxidation of acetaldehyde", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900820), vol. 113, no. 8, Database accession no. 61684, XP002097638 [X] 20-23 * abstract * |