EP0903344 - Quinazolin-4-one derivatives, their preparation and their use as hair growth promoters or in external compositions for skin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO CO., LTD. 5-5, Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [2011/04] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Koji c/o Shiseido Research Center, 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8553 / JP | 02 /
Fukunishi, Hirotada c/o Shiseido Research Center, 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8553 / JP | 03 /
Magara, Tsunao c/o Shiseido Research Center, 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8553 / JP | [2010/38] |
Former [1999/12] | 01 /
Kobayashi, Koji c/o Shiseido Res. Ctr., 1050, Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 223-8553 / JP | ||
02 /
Fukunishi, Hirotada c/o Shiseido Res. Ctr., 1050, Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 223-8553 / JP | |||
03 /
Magara, Tsunao c/o Shiseido Res. Ctr., 1050, Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa, 223-8553 / JP | Representative(s) | Lippert, Hans-Joachim Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Lippert, Hans-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner, Patentanwälte, Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115662.3 | 20.08.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | JP19970240362 | 21.08.1997 Original published format: JP 24036297 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0903344 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903344 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q7/00, C07D239/90, A61K31/505 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
C07D239/90 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/4953 (EP,KR,US);
A61Q7/00 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/12] | C07D239/90, A61K31/505, A61K7/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/49] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Chinazolin-4-on Derivate, deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung als Haarwuchsmittel oder in äusserlich anzuwendenden Hautpflegemitteln | [1999/12] | English: | Quinazolin-4-one derivatives, their preparation and their use as hair growth promoters or in external compositions for skin | [1999/12] | French: | Dérivés de quinazolin-4-one, leur préparation et leur utilisation comme agents favorisant la croissance des cheveux ou dans une composition pour la peau à usage externe | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 02.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.01.2011 | NL | 26.01.2011 | SE | 26.01.2011 | [2012/23] |
Former [2011/42] | NL | 26.01.2011 | |
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | SE | 26.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3558610 (BREUER HERMANN, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * claim 7 *; | [X]DE2027645 (BYK-GULDEN LOMBERG CHEMISCHE FABRIK GMBH) [X] 1,4,5 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0169537 (MITSUBISHI YUKA PHARMA [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]JPH07258224 ; | [X]WO9710221 (TORREY PINES INST [US]) [X] 1-5 * claims 1,3-5,10,11,14 *; | [PX]US5756502 (PADIA JANAK KHIMCHAND [US]) [PX] 1-5 * column 4 - column 5 * * column 27, line 50 - line 60 *; | [PX]WO9826664 (DU PONT [US], et al) [PX] 1,4,5 * claims 1,5 *; | [Y]GB2197589 (OREAL) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH04253904 | [X] - HAMAD M.M. ET AL., "Some reactions of 2-(.alpha.-naphthylmethyl)-(4H)-3,1- benzoxazin-4-one", PAKISTAN JOURNAL OF SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH, (199306), vol. 36, no. 6-7, pages 228 - 231, XP002089826 [X] 1,2 * compound (3b) *; page 230, column 1 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 50, Database accession no. 95-385642, XP002089827 & JPH07258224 A 19951009 (DAIICHI PHARM. CO. LTD.) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930125), vol. 17, no. 37, Database accession no. (C - 1019), & JP04253904 A 19920909 (KANEBO LTD.) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * |