EP0901858 - Quick-change chuck device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POWER TOOL HOLDERS INCORPORATED Suite 15, 501 Silverside Road Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [1999/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Montjoy, Kenneth M. 532 Squire Circle Clemson, South Carolina 29631 / US | 02 /
Huggins, Mark S. 24 Foy Creek Drive Clemson, South Carolina 29631 / US | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115705.0 | 20.08.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | US19970922411 | 03.09.1997 Original published format: US 922411 | US19980067569 | 28.04.1998 Original published format: US 67569 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901858 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/20 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
H01L29/7824 (EP,US);
B23B31/202 (EP,US);
Y10S279/905 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17196 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17341 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17512 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17752 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1999/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schnellwechselfutter | [1999/11] | English: | Quick-change chuck device | [1999/11] | French: | Mandrin à changement rapide | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 04.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/38] | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB587871 (GEORGE WILLIAM GRAVELL) [A] 1,18,27 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3508513 (HERTEL KARL [DE]) |