EP0898935 - Patient monitoring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Kohden Corporation 31-4, 1-chome, Nishiochiai Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states Nihon Kohden Corporation 31-4, 1-chome, Nishiochiai Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ochiai, Ryoichi, c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation 31-4, Nishiochiai, 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sugo, Yoshihiro, c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation 31-4, Nishiochiai, 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sohama, Takeshi, c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation 31-4, Nishiochiai, 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Rie, c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation 31-4, Nishiochiai, 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Chen, Wenxi, c/o Nihon Kohden Corporation 31-4, Nishiochiai, 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/09] | Schumann, Klaus, Dr. rer. nat., et al Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115721.7 | 20.08.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | JP19970223271 | 20.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22327197 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0898935 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0452, A61B5/022 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
A61B5/022 (EP,US);
A61B5/349 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/46] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Patientenüberwachungsgerät | [1999/09] | English: | Patient monitoring apparatus | [1999/09] | French: | Appareil de surveillance pour patients | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 04.09.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/02] | 11.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2604460 (LAMPADIUS MICHAEL S DIPL ING) [X] 1 * page 15, line 1 - page 16, line 18 * * page 17, line 30 - line 33 * * page 20, line 21 - page 21, line 7; figure 3 * [A] 2-5; | [A]EP0123313 (NIPPON COLIN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 6, line 20 - column 10, line 14 ** column 15, line 2 - column 16, line 7; figure 4 *; | [XA]EP0542413 (STUART MEDICAL INC [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 57 - column 8, line 50 * [A] 2-5 |