EP0899153 - Vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARACO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 25, Kamifujiike, Yoshiwara-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 473-8512 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states ARACO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 25, Kamifujiike, Yoshiwara-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 473-8512 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tateyama, Hiroyuki Araco K. K., 25 Kamifujiike, Yoshiwara-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 473-8512 / JP | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/09] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98115914.8 | 24.08.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | JP19970228193 | 25.08.1997 Original published format: JP 22819397 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0899153 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0899153 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/38 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
B60N2/986 (EP,US);
B29C44/1252 (EP,US);
B29C44/582 (EP,US);
B60N2/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/46] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsitz | [1999/09] | English: | Vehicle seat | [1999/09] | French: | Siège de véhicule | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 09.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0381113 ; | [A]US4350544 (MATSUNO YOSHIO) [A] 1,8,9* column W *; | [XA]US4623196 (RONEY THOMAS W [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column A * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 38; figures 1-6 * [A] 3,6-11; | [A]US4810035 (TAKAHASHI FUJIO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column A; figures 2,4,5; claim 1 *; | [A]US5048894 (MIYAJIMA IWAO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figures 3-8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910625), vol. 15, no. 249, Database accession no. (M - 1128), & JP03081113 A 19910405 (IKEDA BUSSAN CO LTD) [A] 1,6,7,10,11 * abstract * |