EP0886068 - Gear pump with multiple driven shafts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maag Pump Systems Textron AG Hardstrasse 219 8023 Zürich / CH | [1998/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bussard, Maurice Webermühle 42 5432 Neuenhof / CH | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach 8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 98115962.7 | 25.08.1998 | [1998/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0886068 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0886068 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886068 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04C15/00 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
F04C15/008 (EP,US);
F04C2240/402 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [1999/48] |
Former [1998/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zahnradpumpe mit einem Mehrwellenantrieb | [1998/52] | English: | Gear pump with multiple driven shafts | [1998/52] | French: | Pompe à engrenages à arbres d'entraînements multiples | [1998/52] | Examination procedure | 13.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3230550 (MAAG ZAHNRAEDER & MASCHINEN AG [CH]) [DA] 1* page 6, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE3928451 (SCHMIDT GUENTHER [DE]) [Y] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0472933 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 13, line 9; figures 3,9-13 *; | [A]EP0502459 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 18 - column 12, line 17; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9429596 (SIHI GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * page 3, line 1 - page 14, line 5; figures 1-3; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE3230550 | - ROLF FISHCHER, ELEKTRISCH MASCHINEN, (19830101), no. 5, page 170-260 |