EP0902204 - Coupling with torsional resiliency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centa-Antriebe Kirschey GmbH Bergische Strasse 7 42781 Haan / DE | [2001/47] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states CENTA-ANTRIEBE KIRSCHEY GmbH Bergische Strasse 7 D-42781 Haan / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirschey, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Ittertaler Strasse 52 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Patentanwälte Ostriga & Sonnet Stresemannstrasse 6-8 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 98116633.3 | 03.09.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | DE19971039334 | 09.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19739334 | [1999/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0902204 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902204 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/58 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
F16D3/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Drehelastische Wellenkupplung | [1999/11] | English: | Coupling with torsional resiliency | [1999/11] | French: | Accouplement à élasticité en torsion | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/42] | 09.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2125559 (WILSON HAMILL WILLIAM) [X] 1-3 * page 3, column L, line 44 - line 57; figures 26,28 *; | [A]FR2350501 (TRANSMISSIONS STE INDLE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 7 - line 13; figure 5 *; | [A]FR2176335 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 4; figure 2 *; | [A]US5657545 (HAWORTH JOHN E [US], et al) [A] 3 * abstract * | by applicant | DE2630506 |