EP0900616 - Saw blade with saw teeth configuration and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIKUS-Sägenfabrik Wilhelm H. Kullmann GmbH & Co. KG. Melsunger Strasse 30 34286 Spangenberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states WIKUS-Sägenfabrik Wilhelm H. Kullmann GmbH & Co. KG. Melsunger Strasse 30 34286 Spangenberg / DE | ||
Former [1999/10] | For all designated states WIKUS-Sägenfabrik Wilhelm H. Kullmann Melsunger Strasse 30 D-34286 Spangenberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kullmann, Jörg H. Dr. Zum Steinbach 2 34286 Spangenberg / DE | 02 /
Fluhrer, Manfred Dipl.-Ing. Am Herrenland 17 34286 Spangenberg / DE | [1999/10] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [1999/10] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Am Kirschberge 22 37085 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98116700.0 | 03.09.1998 | [1999/10] | Priority number, date | DE1997139074 | 08.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19739074 | [1999/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0900616 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0900616 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0900616 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23D61/02, B23D61/12 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
B23D61/021 (EP,US);
Y10T408/8957 (EP,US);
Y10T83/935 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9355 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9358 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/10] | B23D61/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2002/03] |
Former [1999/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sägeblatt mit Sägezahnkonfiguration und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1999/10] | English: | Saw blade with saw teeth configuration and method for its production | [1999/10] | French: | Lame de scie à configuration de dents de sciage et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1999/10] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 26.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, FI, GR, LU, MC | 18.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.12.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4727788 (YOSHIDA SUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * figures 1-20 *; | [A]DE9311471U (KULLMANN WIKUS SAEGENFAB [DE]); | [A]FR2707904 (MANUF FOREZIENNE LAMES SCI [FR]) [A] 1,7 * figures 4,6,7 * |