EP0905667 - Method for marking boxes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conti Temic Microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fendt, Günter Balthasar-Lacher-Strasse 5 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | 02 /
Baur, Richard Ziegelfeldstrasse 6A 85276 Pfaffenhofen / DE | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/05] |
Former [1999/13] | Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Daimler-Benz AG, Intellectual Property Management, Postfach 35 35 74025 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 98116763.8 | 04.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | DE1997142456 | 26.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19742456 | [1999/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905667 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0905667 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09F7/16, G09F3/10 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
G09F7/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/50] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kennzeichnung von Gehäusen | [1999/13] | English: | Method for marking boxes | [1999/13] | French: | Méthode de marquage de cases | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 12.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2003
14.05.2003
ADMISSIBLE WABCO GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [2003/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2003
WABCO GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Schrödter, Manfred WABCO GmbH & Co. OHG, Postfach 91 12 62 30432 Hannover / DE | 14.10.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.04.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.04.2004 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2004 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.03.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH05313585 ; | [A]DE4136619 (HOEFLER HANS [DE]) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [Y]US5535536 (COMANN TYLER K [US]) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940303), vol. 018, no. 129, Database accession no. (P - 1703), & JP05313585 A 19931126 (YUSHI SEIHIN KK) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * |