EP0911195 - Rubber-and-metal bush for mounting a stabiliser bar on a motor vehicle body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VORWERK & SOHN GmbH & Co. KG Obere Lichtenplatzer Strasse 336 D-42287 Wuppertal / DE | [1999/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tepel, Jörg Peter Am Braken 2 58285 Gevelsberg / DE | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Honke, Manfred, et al Patentanwälte, Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Honke, Manfred, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98116914.7 | 08.09.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | DE1997146357 | 21.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19746357 | [1999/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911195 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911195 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0911195 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60G21/055, F16F1/38 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
B60G21/0551 (EP);
F16F1/3842 (EP);
B60G2204/1222 (EP);
B60G2204/41043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/20] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gummi/Metall-Lager zur Anlenkung eines Stabilisators an einem Kraftfahrzeugaufbau | [1999/17] | English: | Rubber-and-metal bush for mounting a stabiliser bar on a motor vehicle body | [1999/17] | French: | Palier métal-caoutchouc pour monter une barre stabilisatrice sur la carosserie d'un véhicule à moteur | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.10.2002 | GB | 23.10.2002 | IT | 23.10.2002 | SE | 23.01.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 23.10.2002 | |
GB | 23.10.2002 | ||
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | GB | 23.10.2002 | |
SE | 23.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | SE | 23.01.2003 | |
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 23.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0384799 (CAOUTCHOUC MANUF PLASTIQUE [FR]) [DX] 1,2,14 * column 6, line 11 - line 36; figure 3 *; | [A]DE4204252 (LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [A] 1,14 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0381945 (JOERN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,14 * abstract *; | [A]DE8901526U (VORWERK & SOHN) [A] 1,3,14 * figures 1,5 *; | [A]DE4413666 (LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0381566 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |