EP0902490 - Positive electrode material for alkaline storage battery and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanigawa, Futoshi A-107, 4-9-21, Honkugenuma Fujisawa City, 251-0028 / JP | 02 /
Katsumoto, Masumi Shosenryo, 422, Ueki Kamakura City, 247-0073 / JP | 03 /
Kato, Fumio Shosenryo, 422, Ueki Kamakura City, 247-0073 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Tatsuhiko Shosenryo, 422, Ueki Kamakura City, 247-0073 / JP | 05 /
Dansui, Yoshitaka 817-1-301, Ishikawa Fujisawa City, 252-0815 / JP | 06 /
Yuasa, Kohji 1-13, Heiwa-cho Chigasaki City, 253-0024 / JP | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Dr. Elisabeth Jung Dr. Jürgen Schirdewahn Dipl.-Ing. Claus Gernhardt Postfach 40 14 68 80714 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98116997.2 | 08.09.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | JP19970245041 | 10.09.1997 Original published format: JP 24504197 | JP19980188637 | 03.07.1998 Original published format: JP 18863798 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0902490 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0902490 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902490 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/52, C01G51/04, C01G53/04 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
H01M4/52 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/11] | H01M4/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2000/11] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Positivelektrodenmaterial für alkalische Speicherbatterie und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1999/11] | English: | Positive electrode material for alkaline storage battery and method of producing the same | [1999/11] | French: | Materiau d'électrode positive pour accumulateur alcalin et son procédé de fabrication | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 17.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0757395 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,10,12 * page 3, line 26 - line 27; claims 1,2,4-6 * * page 4, line 25 - line 35 * * page 5, line 41 - line 47 *; | [E]EP0866510 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,4-6 * page 5, line 9 - line 11; claim 15 * |