EP0903070 - Apparatus for spreading granular material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dreyer, Heinz, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Am Amazonenwerk 7 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [1999/12] | Application number, filing date | 98117106.9 | 10.09.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | DE1997141653 | 22.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19741653 | DE1997148178 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19748178 | [1999/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0903070 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A01C17/00 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
A01C17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/49] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausstreuen von körnigem Material | [1999/12] | English: | Apparatus for spreading granular material | [1999/12] | French: | Appareil pour epandre du materiau granulaire | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 22.07.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8634268U (DREYER) [X] 1,3,10 * page 3, lines 15-26 - page 10, lines 2-17; figures 1-9 *; | [YA]EP0497166 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 6 - column 6, line 19; figures 1-7 * [A] 3,10; | [YA]EP0559242 (AMAZONEN WERKE DREYER H [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 4, line 30 - column 6, line 56; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,5,8,13; | [A]DE8329978U (DREYER) [A] 1,3 * page 12, line 1 - page 15, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE3529452 |