EP0903774 - Substrate plating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/05] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hongo, Akihisa 46-23 Zenbu-cho, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ogure, Naoaki 5-32-2 Chuo, Nakano-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Hiroaki 4-17-18 Tamagawagakuen Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kimura, Norio 1-5-11-408 Kugenumashinmei Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Kuriyama, Fumio 201, 2833-43 Totsuka-cho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Tsujimura, Manabu 4-44-8 Sakaechodori, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Suzuki, Kenichi 1-9-21-104 Inari Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 08 /
Chono, Atsushi 1-9-21-104 Inari Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98117633.2 | 17.09.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | JP19970270493 | 17.09.1997 Original published format: JP 27049397 | JP19980071370 | 05.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7137098 | JP19980096974 | 26.03.1998 Original published format: JP 9697498 | JP19980205138 | 21.07.1998 Original published format: JP 20513898 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903774 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903774 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903774 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
C25D17/001 (EP,US);
H01L21/00 (KR);
H01L21/2885 (EP,US);
H01L21/67051 (EP,US);
H01L21/67161 (EP,US);
H01L21/67167 (EP,US);
H01L21/67173 (EP,US);
H01L21/6719 (EP,US);
H01L21/67219 (EP,US);
H01L21/6723 (EP,US);
H01L21/76849 (EP,US);
H01L21/76877 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/42] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Substratbeschichtung | [1999/12] | English: | Substrate plating apparatus | [1999/12] | French: | Dispositif de revêtement de substrat | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 28.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10163208 ; | [A]US5415890 (KLOIBER ALLAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5 *; | [A]US5092975 (YAMAMURA TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0773308 (SPUTTERED FILMS INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 7 - column 8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10163208 A 19980619 (IND TECHNOL RES INST) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 19 - page 20; figures 2,5 * |