EP0903236 - Liquid containment and dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Owens-Illinois Closure, Inc. Three O-I Plaza One Michael Owens Way Perrysburg, OH 43551-2999 / US | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states Owens-Illinois Closure, Inc. Three O-I Plaza One Michael Owens Way Perrysburg, OH 43551-2999 / US | ||
For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One Seagate, 25-LDP Toledo Ohio 43666 / US | ||
For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One Seagate, 25-LDP Toledo, Ohio 43666 / US | ||
For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | |||
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states OWENS-ILLINOIS CLOSURE INC. One Seagate, 25-LDP Toledo, Ohio 43666 / US | ||
For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY 1000 NE Circle Boulevard Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wallace, Kenneth J. 3647 Eagle Emblem Court Greenwood, IN 46143 / US | 02 /
Hmelar, Susan M. Holsteinische Str. 38/2 10717 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Contaxis, William III 75 Oakridge Lane Milford, CT 06460 / US | [1999/19] |
Former [1999/12] | 01 /
Wallace, Kenneth J. 3647 Eagle Emblem Court Greenwood, IN 46143 / US | ||
02 /
Hmelar, Susan M. 2015 SW Whiteside Drive Corvallis, OR 97333 / US | |||
03 /
Contaxis, William III 75 Oakridge Lane Milford, CT 06460 / US | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98117752.0 | 18.09.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | US19970934564 | 22.09.1997 Original published format: US 934564 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903236 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903236 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903236 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/1755 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/12] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsbehälter und Abgabevorrichtung | [1999/12] | English: | Liquid containment and dispensing device | [1999/12] | French: | Conteneur de fluide et dispositif de délivrance | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0622208 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 35; figure 3 *; | [A]US5467118 (GRAGG BRIAN D [US], et al); | [X]EP0739740 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 11; figure 3 *; | [A]US5617128 (THOMAN JEFFREY A [US], et al); | [PX]EP0816098 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [PX] 1-9 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 47; figures 1,2 *; | [E]US5856840 (BARINAGA JOHN A JR [US], et al) [E] 1,9 * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 12; figure 3 * | by applicant | US19950429987 |