EP0915008 - Support device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beyer, Roland Haulenbergstrasse 6 76228 Karlsruhe / DE | [1999/19] | Application number, filing date | 98118074.8 | 24.09.1998 | [1999/19] | Priority number, date | DE1997149230 | 07.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19749230 | [1999/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0915008 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0915008 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62D65/00, B23K37/04 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
B23K37/0443 (EP,US);
B62D65/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49998 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53091 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53961 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53991 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/03] |
Former [1999/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung | [1999/19] | English: | Support device | [1999/19] | French: | Dispositif de support | [1999/19] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 08.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2212421 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,4,11-14 * abstract *; | [A]US4960974 (SHIGENAKA MAKOTO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 46 - line 68; figures 4-6 *; | [A]FR2578464 (STEELWELD FRANCE [FR]) |