EP0904851 - Door panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.E.K.- Haustürfüllungen GmbH An der Raffinerie 4 b 04617 Rositz / DE | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elsner, Frank Gladbecker Strasse 14 33649 Bielefeld / DE | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Eichler, Peter Sturies-Eichler-Füssel Patentanwälte Lönsstrasse 55 42289 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Eichler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Peter Eichler, Dipl.-Ing. Michael Füssel, Brahmsstrasse 29 42289 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 98118187.8 | 25.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | DE1997142298 | 25.09.1997 Original published format: DE 19742298 | [1999/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0904851 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0904851 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | [2000/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/04, E06B3/70 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
B05D1/045 (EP);
B05D1/04 (EP);
E06B3/7001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/45] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Türfüllung | [1999/13] | English: | Door panel | [1999/13] | French: | Panneau de porte | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 03.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/41] | 08.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4035466 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH) [A] 1,3-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0274707 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC) [A] 1,2,6-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 34 * * column 3, line 16 - line 34 * * figure - * | [A] - ELMOURSI A A ET AL, "ELECTROSTATIC PAINTING OF PLASTICS USING METAL BACKING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 29, no. 6, ISSN 0093-9994, page 1053-1057, XP000439260 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/28.259712 |