EP0909998 - Non-contact control of armature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grohe Water Technology AG & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 137 58675 Hemer / DE | [2003/48] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Friedrich Grohe AG & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 137 58675 Hemer / DE | ||
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states FRIEDRICH GROHE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Hauptstrasse 137 D-58675 Hemer / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Körfgen, Harald Am Hillebach 18 58675 Hemer / DE | 02 /
Karakullukcu, Ali Horlecke 20 58706 Menden / DE | [1999/16] | Application number, filing date | 98118270.2 | 26.09.1998 | [1999/16] | Priority number, date | DE1997145972 | 17.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19745972 | [1999/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0909998 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0909998 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0909998 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/409, G05D23/13 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
G05B19/409 (EP);
E03C1/057 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/16] | G05B19/409 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT [2003/01] |
Former [1999/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Berührungslos gesteuerte Armatur | [1999/16] | English: | Non-contact control of armature | [1999/16] | French: | Commande à distance d'armature | [1999/16] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 11.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.02.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, GR, IE, LU, MC, SE | 24.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.12.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.12.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 10.12.2003 | NL | 10.12.2003 | PT | 10.05.2004 | [2008/12] |
Former [2004/45] | GB | 10.12.2003 | |
NL | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | NL | 10.12.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3643519 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 5; figure 2 *; | [DA]DE3709670 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * figure 2 *; | [DA]DE4306199 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]); | [DA]DE4420331 (GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]); | [E]US5868311 (CRETU-PETRA EUGEN [US]) [E] 1 * column 4, line 25 - column 8, line 15 * |