EP0905528 - Extended range traffic alert and collision avoidance system (TCAS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aviation Communication & Surveillance Systems, LLC 19810 N. 7th Avenue Phoenix, Arizona 85027-4400 / US | [2006/17] |
Former [2002/30] | For all designated states L-3 Communications Corporation 19810 N. 7th Avenue Phoenix, Arizona 85027-4400 / US | ||
Former [2002/26] | For all designated states L-3 Communications Corporation 21111 N. 19th Ave. Phoenix, Arizona 85027-2708 / US | ||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Mark D. 5341 West Plute Glendale, AZ 85308 / US | 02 /
Fajen, Lyle A. 12201 North 61st Place Scottsdale, AZ 85254 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2004/49] | Parry, Simon James, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/30] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/50] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert, et al Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2000/52] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/13] | Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Honeywell Holding AG, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39 63067 Offenbach am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 98118350.2 | 28.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | US19970940420 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: US 940420 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0905528 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0905528 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0905528 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/74, G01S13/93 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
G01S13/933 (EP,US);
G01S13/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/24] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bereichserweitertes Verkehrsalarm- und Kollisionsvermeidungs-System (TCAS) | [1999/13] | English: | Extended range traffic alert and collision avoidance system (TCAS) | [1999/13] | French: | Système d'alarme de trafic et évitement de collision (TCAS) à portée augmentée | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 26.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2004 | 30.09.2005 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9720230 (HONEYWELL INC [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6,8 * the whole document *; | [A] - BOISVERT R E ET AL, "ADS-MODE S SYSTEM OVERVIEW", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AIAA/IEEE DIGITAL AVIONICS SYSTEMS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, OCT. 25 - 28, 1993, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19931025), no. CONF. 12, pages 104 - 109, XP000451645 [A] 1,4,6,8 * page 107, column R * |