EP0907248 - Electronic component, ladder filter and communication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Unami, Toshihiko, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/14] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98118472.4 | 30.09.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | JP19970286175 | 01.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28617597 | JP19980247206 | 01.09.1998 Original published format: JP 24720698 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0907248 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0907248 | Date: | 24.07.2002 | [2002/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/17, H03H9/58 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
H03H9/605 (EP,US);
H03H9/13 (KR);
H03H9/178 (EP,US);
H03H9/02118 (KR);
H03H9/173 (KR);
H03H9/177 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, SE [2003/16] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektronisches Bauteil, Abzweigfilter und Kommunikationsgerät | [1999/14] | English: | Electronic component, ladder filter and communication apparatus | [1999/14] | French: | Composant électronique, filtre en échelle et appareil de communication | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PLX]EP0829957 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [PLX] 1-16* priority; page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 9; figures 15-17 * |