EP0967586 - Device for learning foreign languages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grabmayr, Josef Baumerstrasse 19 83071 Schlossberg / DE | [1999/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grabmayr, Josef Baumerstrasse 19 83071 Schlossberg / DE | [1999/52] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/52] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, Dipl.-Phys., et al Andrae Flach Haug Prinzregentenstrasse 24 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98118565.5 | 01.10.1998 | [1999/52] | Priority number, date | DE1998128407 | 25.06.1998 Original published format: DE 19828407 | [1999/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0967586 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0967586 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0967586 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G09B19/08, G09B3/02, G09B1/02 | [1999/52] | CPC: |
G09B1/02 (EP);
G09B19/08 (EP);
G09B3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/48] |
Former [1999/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fremdsprachen-Lernvorrichtung | [1999/52] | English: | Device for learning foreign languages | [1999/52] | French: | Dispositif d'apprentissage de langues etrangères | [1999/52] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 05.03.2003 | GR | 05.03.2003 | IE | 05.03.2003 | IT | 05.03.2003 | NL | 05.03.2003 | DK | 05.06.2003 | PT | 05.06.2003 | SE | 05.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | LU | 01.10.2003 | BE | 31.10.2003 | [2008/12] |
Former [2005/01] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
GR | 05.03.2003 | ||
IE | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
DK | 05.06.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.10.2003 | ||
BE | 31.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
GR | 05.03.2003 | ||
IE | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
DK | 05.06.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
LU | 01.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
GR | 05.03.2003 | ||
IE | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
DK | 05.06.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
GR | 05.03.2003 | ||
IE | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
GR | 05.03.2003 | ||
IE | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
GR | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
SE | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
GR | 05.03.2003 | ||
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
NL | 05.03.2003 | ||
PT | 05.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 05.03.2003 | |
NL | 05.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2160293 (SAUNDERS ROY) [X] 1,2,4 * claim 1 * * claim 6 * [A] 15; | [X]US4802855 (WOOD HARRY E [US]) [X] 1,11,12 * column 2, line 1 - line 11 * * column 2, line 49 - line 63 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB2248961 (HEMMINGS TERENCE PHILIP) [X] 1 * page 2, line 23 - line 25 ** claim 1 * |