EP0913365 - Thermally resistant glass for lamp envelopes and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [1999/18] | For:BE
DE
ES
FR
IT
NL
Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
For:GB
CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG trading as SCHOTT GLAS Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naumann, Karin, Dr. Gutenbergstrasse 19 55270 Ober-Olm / DE | 02 /
Becker, Otmar, Dr. Westendstrasse 30 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
Ott, Franz, Dr. Glaswerk 30 95666 Mitterteich / DE | [1999/18] | Application number, filing date | 98118758.6 | 05.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | DE1997147355 | 27.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19747355 | [1999/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0913365 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913365 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/085, C03C3/093, H01K1/28 | [1999/18] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/03] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Thermisch hochbelastbares Glas für Lampenkolben und dessen Verwendung | [1999/18] | English: | Thermally resistant glass for lamp envelopes and its use | [1999/18] | French: | Verre à haute résistance thermique pour envelopper des lampes et son utilisation | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/18] | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.01.2003
06.02.2003
ADMISSIBLE TELUX Lampenrohr GmbH Strasse der Einheit 2-24 02943 Weisswasser / DE Opponent's representative Uhlemann, Henry Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Bamberger Strasse 49 01187 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.01.2003
TELUX Lampenrohr GmbH Strasse der Einheit 2-24 02943 Weisswasser / DE Opponent's representative Uhlemann, Henry, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwalt, Kailuweit & Uhlemann, Bamberger Strasse 49 01187 Dresden / DE | 05.03.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.06.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.04.2004 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 25.06.2004 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 11.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2010 | 12.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 24.12.2010 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.10.2004 | IT | 05.10.2005 | GB | 05.10.2006 | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/34] | BE | 31.10.2004 | |
IT | 05.10.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 31.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4298388 (SACK WERNER) [DA] 1-8 * example 10; claim - *; | [A]EP0261819 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) [A] 1-8 * examples 5,14; claim - *; | [A]EP0638526 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 5, line 45 - line 52 * * example 3; claim 3 *; | [DA]US5489558 (MOFFATT DAWNE M [US], et al) [DA] 1-8* claim - * |