EP0911352 - Baking coating and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Melchiors, Martin, Dr. Walter-Flex-Strasse 20 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Hovestadt, Wieland, Dr. Weissdornweg 13 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 03 /
Brück, Jochen, Dr. Weidenweg 8 51491 Overath / DE | 04 /
Engbert, Theodor, Dr. Hebbelstrasse 13c 50968 Köln / DE | 05 /
Buysch, Hans-Josef, Dr. Brandenburger Strasse 28 47809 Krefeld / DE | [1999/17] | Application number, filing date | 98119096.0 | 09.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | DE1997146379 | 21.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19746379 | [1999/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911352 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911352 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/28, C09D175/04, C09D201/06 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
C09D167/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/225 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/244 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/2805 (KR);
C08G18/283 (EP,US);
C08G18/4063 (EP,KR,US);
C09D169/00 (EP,US);
C09D175/06 (EP,US);
C09D201/06 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/00 (KR);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09D167/00, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
C09D169/00, C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C09D201/06, C08L2666/34 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einbrennüberzugsmittel und seine Verwendung | [1999/17] | English: | Baking coating and its use | [1999/17] | French: | Agent de recouvrement thermodurcissable et son utilisation | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 26.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 12.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0665260 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [DX] 1-3 * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 1; example -; claim 1 *; | [DX]DE4432647 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DX] 1 * column 1, line 29 - column 6, line 4; example -; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0120466 (BASF FARBEN & FASERN [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 1 - page 11, line 15; example 2; claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0600417 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 22 - page 6, line 11; claim 1 * |