EP0919648 - Device for controlling textile fibers floating through drawing cylinders in a combing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARZOLI S.p.A. Via S. Alberto, 2 25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio (Brescia) / IT | [2004/12] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Marzoli S.p.A. Via S. Alberto, 2 25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio (Brescia) / IT | ||
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states FRATELLI MARZOLI & C. S.p.A. Via Verdi, 11 I-24100 Bergamo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prandini, Girolamo Via S. Alberto, 2 25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio (Brescia) / IT | 02 /
Pasini, Giovanni Battista Via S. Alberto, 2 25036 Palazzolo Sull'Oglio (Brescia) / IT | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | De Gregori, Antonella Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/37] | Parisi, Luigi Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1999/22] | Cicogna, Franco Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98119228.9 | 12.10.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | IT1997MI02499 | 07.11.1997 Original published format: IT MI972499 | [1999/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0919648 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0919648 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | [2000/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0919648 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D01G19/08, D01G21/00 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
D01G19/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, MC [2001/15] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Überwachung der durch die Streckzylinder einer Kämmaschine schwebenden Textilfaser | [1999/22] | English: | Device for controlling textile fibers floating through drawing cylinders in a combing machine | [1999/22] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de fibres textiles flottantes au travers de cylindres d'étirage dans une machine de peignage | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 14.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2005/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2089854 (ZINSER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, line 80 - page 3, line 33; figures 1,4; claim 1 *; | [YA]EP0478992 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-6; claims 4-6 * [A] 6-8; | [A]EP0376002 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 5 - line 18; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]GB1482618 (SANT ANDREA NOVARA OFFICINE) |