EP0909954 - Detection of cartilage diseases by MIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.2004 [2004/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scil Technology GmbH Fraunhoferstrasse 15 82152 Martinsried / DE | [2004/05] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Scil Technology Holding GmbH Fraunhoferstrasse 15 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosserhoff, Anja-Katrin, Dr. Donaustauferstrasse 206B 93059 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
Büttner, Reinhard, Dr. Fichtenweg 4 93090 Bach/Donau / DE | 03 /
Kaufmann, Martin Fischerried 29 82362 Weilheim / DE | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Böhm, Brigitte, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119255.2 | 13.10.1998 | [1999/16] | Priority number, date | US19970062234P | 16.10.1997 Original published format: US 62234 P | [1999/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0909954 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0909954 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/577 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/6887 (EP,US);
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
G01N2800/102 (EP,US);
G01N2800/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/01] |
Former [1999/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Nachweis von Knorpelerkrankungen mit MIA | [1999/16] | English: | Detection of cartilage diseases by MIA | [1999/16] | French: | Détection des maladies des cartilages par MIA | [1999/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 26.11.2003 | ES | 09.03.2004 | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/33] | NL | 26.11.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8907764 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1; | [AD]WO9119001 (NAT RES DEV [GB])[AD] 1; | [XP]DE19653358 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-7 | Examination | EP0085415 |