EP0915254 - Injector controlled by a magnetic valve for an accumulator system of a multicylinder internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Augustin, Ulrich Dr. Schillerstrasse 25/1 71394 Kernen / DE | [1999/19] | Application number, filing date | 98119433.5 | 15.10.1998 | [1999/19] | Priority number, date | DE1997148999 | 06.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19748999 | [1999/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0915254 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0915254 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02M63/00 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
F02M63/0007 (EP,US);
F02M63/0005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/15] |
Former [1999/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnetventilgesteuerter Injektor für ein Speichersystem einer mehrzylindrigen Brennkraftmaschine | [1999/19] | English: | Injector controlled by a magnetic valve for an accumulator system of a multicylinder internal combustion engine | [1999/19] | French: | Injecteur commandé par une vanne magnétique pour un système d' accumulation d'un moteur à combustion interne à plusieurs cylindres | [1999/19] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 16.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0657642 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 3 - line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]US5526791 (TIMMER ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 6; figure 1 *; | [YD]DE19612738 (AVL VERBRENNUNGSKRAFT MESSTECH [AT]) [YD] 1 * column 4, line 14 - line 55; figure 2 * |