EP0917319 - Interconnection of Fibre Channel switches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oyama, Hiroaki c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus, et al Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann, Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119564.7 | 16.10.1998 | [1999/20] | Priority number, date | JP19970283578 | 16.10.1997 Original published format: JP 28357897 | [1999/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0917319 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0917319 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L12/24 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
H04L49/357 (EP,US);
H04L45/02 (US);
H04L49/253 (EP,US);
H04L49/30 (EP,US);
H04L49/3009 (EP,US);
H04L49/3027 (EP,US);
H04L49/351 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/20] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2003/42] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbindung zwischen Fibre-Channel-Vermittlungsschaltern | [1999/20] | English: | Interconnection of Fibre Channel switches | [1999/20] | French: | Interconnection de commutateurs Fibre Channel | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/33] | 15.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5138615 (LAMPORT LESLIE B [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 40, line 12 - line 52 * * column 46, line 48 - column 47, line 14 ** figure 9 *; | JPH0832597 [ ] (NEC CORP); | [Y]US5796736 (SUZUKI HIROSHI [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,6,8,9,14,15 * column 5, line 1 - line 9 * * claim 1 *; | [Y] - GEORGIOU C J, "Interconnection structures for highly parallel systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL PHOENIX CONFERENCE ON COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS. TEMPE, MAR. 23 - 26, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930323), vol. CONF. 12, ISBN 0-7803-0922-7, pages 79 - 85, XP010110058 [Y] 1,2,4,6,8,9,14,15 * page 80, column R, line 40 - line 56 * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PCCC.1993.344481 |