EP0909679 - Luggage compartment cover, roller blind or similar, for the luggage space or boot of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOS GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Heinkel-Strasse 2 73760 Ostfildern / DE | [2003/48] |
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states PETER BUTZ GmbH & Co Verwaltungs-KG Kronprinzstrasse 47-49 40764 Langenfeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Labeur, Luc Heidebergstraat 314 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/48] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1999/16] | Patentanwälte Ostriga & Sonnet Stresemannstrasse 6-8 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119573.8 | 16.10.1998 | [1999/16] | Priority number, date | DE19971045940 | 17.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19745940 | [1999/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0909679 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0909679 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0909679 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R5/04 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
B60R5/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/01] |
Former [1999/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Laderaumabdeckung, wie Abdeckrollo od. dgl., für den Lade- bzw. Kofferraum eines Fahrzeugs | [1999/16] | English: | Luggage compartment cover, roller blind or similar, for the luggage space or boot of a vehicle | [1999/16] | French: | Couvercle pour le compartiment à baggages, rideau écran ou similaire pour le compartiment à baggages ou coffre d'un véhicule | [1999/16] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 17.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Request for further processing for: | 03.05.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.07.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.01.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/34] | ES | 29.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0524397 (IEPER IND NV) [X] 1-3,6,13-15,17,23 * column 4, line 49 - column 6, line 17; figures 1-4 * [Y] 4,7,8,20; | [Y]US4277097 (LALANNE ANDRE P) [Y] 4,20 * column 1, lines 49-59 * * column 2, lines 28-52; figures 1,3,4 *; | [Y]DE4313855 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [Y] 7,8 * column 2, lines 14-19; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]DE4200021 (BUTZ PETER VERWALTUNG) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0741057 (CERA) [A] 1,14 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2714342 (CESA) [A] 15 * abstract * |