EP0899705 - Method of producing a sheet of security tags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meto International GmbH Ersheimer Strasse 69 69434 Hirschhorn/Neckar / DE | [1999/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chamberlain, John 7328 San Sebastian Drive Boca Raton, FL 33433 / US | 02 /
Klassen, Gordon 2541 E. Markwood Street Duarte, California 91010 / US | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Menges, Rolf, et al Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Menges, Rolf, et al Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/18] | Menges, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Ackmann, Menges & Demski, Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119673.6 | 16.02.1995 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | DE19944416444 | 10.05.1994 Original published format: DE 4416444 | DE19944436284 | 11.10.1994 Original published format: DE 4436284 | [1999/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899705 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899705 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0899705 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0899705 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/02, G08B13/24 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
G08B13/2437 (EP,US);
G08B13/244 (EP,US);
G08B13/2445 (EP,US);
G09F3/0292 (EP,US);
B32B2519/02 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1457 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1471 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1486 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1999/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Sicherheitsetikettenstreifens | [1999/09] | English: | Method of producing a sheet of security tags | [1999/09] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une feuille d'étiquettes de sécurité | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95102132.8 / EP0682333 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE HERMA GmbH & Co. KG Ulmer Stra e 300 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Raible, Tobias Raible & Raible Patentanwälte Bolzstrasse 3 70173 Stuttgart / DE | 02
03.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE Verband der Hersteller selbstklebender Etiketten u.Schmalbahnconverter eV Bruckmannring 22 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE Opponent's representative Rach, Werner Patentanwalt Südstrasse 19 71083 Herrenberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE HERMA GmbH & Co. KG Ulmer Stra e 300 70327 Stuttgart / DE Opponent's representative Raible, Tobias, Dipl.-Phys. Raible & Raible Schoderstrasse 10 70192 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
03.06.2003
ADMISSIBLE Verband der Hersteller selbstklebender Etiketten u.Schmalbahnconverter eV Bruckmannring 22 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE Opponent's representative Rach, Werner, Dr. Südstrasse 19 71083 Herrenberg / DE | 16.07.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.01.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.09.2005 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.01.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4024723 (MONARCH MARKING SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * Spalte 5, Zeile 3 - Spalte 7, Zeile 4; Abbildungen 3-7,11,16,26,33 *; | [A]EP0446910 (KNOGO CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 53; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0578992 (ESSELTE METO INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,5 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 * | Examination | GB2199010 | EP0232054 | US3457137 | US4475969 | US2304787 | WO9104851 | DE3244430 | US3415705 |