|
14.04.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.11.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2005 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2004 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2004 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.06.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2004 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.01.2004 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.09.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
14.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.1999 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |