EP0920992 - Printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2001 [2001/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISCHER & KRECKE GMBH & CO. Hakenort 47 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [1999/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terstegen, Manfred Horstheider Weg 9 33613 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Steinmeier, Bodo Imsiekstrasse 62 33739 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
Kolbe, Wilfried, Dr. Ing. Küsterkamp 8 21483 Gülzow / DE | 04 /
Schirrich, Klaus Halligstrasse 44 33729 Bielefeld / DE | [1999/23] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/23] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 98119980.5 | 22.10.1998 | [1999/23] | Priority number, date | DE1997154323 | 08.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19754323 | [1999/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0920992 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0920992 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/12, B41F13/18 | [1999/23] | CPC: |
B41F13/14 (EP);
B41P2213/734 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/37] |
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckmaschine | [1999/23] | English: | Printing press | [1999/23] | French: | Machine à imprimer | [1999/23] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/16] | 14.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.08.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.08.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19527199 (BAUMUELLER NUERNBERG GMBH) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 3 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 18; figure 1; claims 1,14 *; | [DY]DE3432572 (GRACE W R & CO) [DY] 1,3 * page 9, line 4 - page 10, line 26 * * page 11, line 34 - page 13, line 12; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4344896 (WIFAG MASCHF) [Y] 1,3 * column 7, line 40 - column 9, line 45; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0768173 (KOENIG & BAUER ALBERT AG) [A] 2 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 47; figure . *; | [A]US5615609 (HILL ALAN M ET AL) [A] 2 * column 4, line 7 - column 6, line 13; figure 1 * | [A] - "SYNAX - EINE SYSTEMLOESUNG FUER DIE ELEKTRONISCHE WELLE", DEUTSCHER DRUCKER, (19970508), vol. 33, no. 18, ISSN 0012-1096, page W30, W32, W34, XP000687995 [A] 1,2 |