EP0920046 - Circuit breaker with sense bar to sense current from voltage drop across bimetal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elms, Robert Tracy 1303 Foxboro Drive Monroeville, Pennsylvania 15146 / US | 02 /
Natili, Thomas Edward 766A North Pike Road Cabot, Pennsylvania 16023 / US | 03 /
Erb, Michael Joseph 247 Lend Street Fombell, Pennsylvania 15123 / US | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/22] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120040.5 | 22.10.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | US19970955779 | 22.10.1997 Original published format: US 955779 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0920046 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0920046 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/16 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
H01H71/125 (EP,US);
H01H71/16 (EP,US);
H01H2083/201 (EP,US);
H01H83/144 (EP,US);
H01H83/20 (EP,US);
H02H1/0015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/22] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schutzschalter mit Stromfühler für Bimetallauslöser | [1999/22] | English: | Circuit breaker with sense bar to sense current from voltage drop across bimetal | [1999/22] | French: | Commutateur protecteur avec détecteur de courant pour déclencheur bimétallique | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 24.08.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3081386 (KOENIG MARTIN F, et al) [A] 1-10; | [A]US4884049 (OYAMA JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1; | [A]US5224006 (MACKENZIE RAYMOND W [US], et al) [A] 1; | [DA]US5301083 (GRASS WILLIAM E [US], et al)[DA] 1; | [A]US5459630 (MACKENZIE RAYMOND W [US], et al) [A] 1; | [DA]US5519561 (MRENNA STEPHEN A [US], et al) [DA] 1 |