EP0918037 - Machine for selectively dispensing four-wire-type ore bridge-type caps for securing stoppers of bottles of sparkling wine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBINO & GALANDRINO S.p.A. Viale Italia, 140/142 I-14053 Canelli (Asti) / IT | [1999/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galandrino, Agostino Viale Risorgimento, 40 14053 Canelli (Asti) / IT | [1999/21] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98120132.0 | 26.10.1998 | [1999/21] | Priority number, date | IT1997TO01015 | 20.11.1997 Original published format: IT TO971015 | [1999/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0918037 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0918037 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B67B5/06 | [1999/21] | CPC: |
B67B5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, PT [2000/05] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Maschine für die wahlweise Abgabe von Vier-Draht oder Brücken-Typ- Käfigen zur Sicherung von Korken für Schaumweinflaschen | [1999/21] | English: | Machine for selectively dispensing four-wire-type ore bridge-type caps for securing stoppers of bottles of sparkling wine | [1999/21] | French: | Machine pour la distribution sélective de muselets à quatre brins ou à étrier pour fixer les bouchons de bouteilles de vin pétillant | [2001/35] |
Former [1999/21] | Machine pour la distribution facultative des muselets à quatres brins ou sous forme d'agrafes pour fixer les bouchons des bouteilles de mousseux | Examination procedure | 27.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 26.06.2002 | PT | 26.09.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/48] | BE | 26.06.2002 | |
PT | 26.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | PT | 26.09.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1177963 (OTTO SICK METALLWARENFABRIK); | [A]DE2411109 (OTTO SICK KG); | [A]FR2259782 (SICK KG OTTO [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0366955 (SICK OTTO GMBH [DE]) |