EP0899953 - Participant location in multimedia collaboration system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Collaboration Properties, Inc. P.O. Box 7097, Suite 7, 913 Village Boulevard Incline Village Nevada 89452 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Collaboration Properties, Inc. P.O. Box 7097, Suite 7, 913 Village Boulevard Incline Village, Nevada 89452 / US | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states VICOR, INC. Unit 2B, 264 Village Boulevard Incline Village, NV 89451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ludwig, Lester F. 1230 Southdown Hillsborough, California 94010 / US | 02 /
Lauwers, Chris J. 1225 Brentwood Street Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 03 /
Lantz, Keith A. 1225 Eureka Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 04 /
Burnett, Gerald J. 207 Atherton Avenue Atherton, CA 94027 / US | 05 /
Burns, Emmett 1555 S. Ely Springs Road Jackson, Wyoming 83001 / US | [2001/44] |
Former [1999/23] | 01 /
Ludwig, Lester F. 1230 Southdown Hillsborough, California 94010 / US | ||
02 /
Lauwers, Chris J. Appartment H-210, 350 Sharon Park Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
03 /
Lantz, Keith A. 1225 Eureka Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | |||
04 /
Burnett, Gerald J. 207 Atherton Avenue Atherton, CA 94027 / US | |||
05 /
Burns, Emmett 1555 S. Ely Springs Road Jackson, Wyoming 83001 / US | |||
Former [1999/09] | 01 /
Ludwig, Lester F. 548 Trinidad Lane Foster City, CA 94404 / US | ||
02 /
Lauwers, Chris J. Appartment H-210, 350 Sharon Park Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | |||
03 /
Lantz, Keith A. 1225 Eureka Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | |||
04 /
Burnett, Gerald J. 207 Atherton Avenue Atherton, CA 94027 / US | |||
05 /
Burns, Emmett R. P.O. Box 7813 Incline Village, NV 89452 / US | Representative(s) | Abnett, Richard Charles Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Abnett, Richard Charles REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1999/09] | Mohun, Stephen John Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road GB-London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98120171.8 | 03.10.1994 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | US19930131523 | 01.10.1993 Original published format: US 131523 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899953 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899953 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0899953 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/15, H04M3/56, H04L12/18 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
H04L12/1813 (EP,US);
H04L12/1818 (EP,US);
H04L12/1822 (EP,US);
H04L12/1827 (EP,US);
H04L12/1831 (EP,US);
H04L51/00 (US);
H04L51/04 (EP,US);
H04L51/10 (EP);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/4038 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04L67/75 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M3/5307 (EP,US);
H04M3/562 (EP,US);
H04M3/563 (EP,US);
H04M3/567 (EP,US);
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
H04N7/148 (EP,US);
H04N7/15 (EP,US);
H04N7/152 (EP,US);
H04L12/1836 (EP,US);
H04L12/185 (EP,US);
H04M2201/38 (EP,US);
H04M2203/5018 (EP,US);
H04M2203/5027 (EP,US);
H04M3/42221 (EP,US);
H04M3/42323 (EP,US);
H04M3/4285 (EP,US);
H04M3/564 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04M7/12 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1305 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13093 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13175 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1319 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1322 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1324 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1326 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1332 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/09] | Title | German: | Teilnehmerlokalisierung in einem Multimedia Kollaborationssystem | [1999/09] | English: | Participant location in multimedia collaboration system | [1999/09] | French: | Localisation de participant dans un système de collaboration multimedia | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 04.06.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 12.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94930561.9 / EP0721726 | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.03.2002 | BE | 27.03.2002 | CH | 27.03.2002 | GR | 27.03.2002 | IT | 27.03.2002 | LI | 27.03.2002 | NL | 27.03.2002 | DK | 27.06.2002 | PT | 27.06.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | IE | 03.10.2002 | LU | 03.10.2002 | [2008/12] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
IE | 03.10.2002 | ||
LU | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
IE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
IE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4953159 (HAYDEN CHARLES C [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 49 *; | [A]DE4304924 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]EP0561649 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A] - SHIRO SAKATA ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT AND EVALUATION OF AN IN-HOUSE MULTIMEDIA DESKTOP CONFERENCE SYSTEM", NEC RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, (19900701), no. 98, pages 107 - 117, XP000166140 | [A] - HORN D N, "A STANDARDS-BASED MULTIMEDIA CONFERENCING BRIDGE", AT & T TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (19930101), vol. 72, no. 1, pages 41 - 49, XP000367734 |