EP0911887 - Light-emitting diode device and method for fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamiyama, Satoshi 5-4-3-905, Hazamagaoka Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1545 / JP | 02 /
Yoshii, Shigeo 54, Uguisudai Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-0815 / JP | 03 /
Miyanaga, Ryoko 2-511-11, Shikishima-cho Nara-shi, Nara 631-0031 / JP | 04 /
Nishikawa, Takashi 5-12-6-1112, Takadono, Asahi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 535-0031 / JP | 05 /
Saitoh, Tohru 2-18-14, Torikai-shinmachi Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0065 / JP | 06 /
Sasai, Yoichi 42-6, Narita-higashigaoka Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0002 / JP | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120254.2 | 26.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | JP19970294317 | 27.10.1997 Original published format: JP 29431797 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911887 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
H01L33/40 (EP,US);
H01L33/00 (KR);
H01L33/42 (EP,US);
H01L33/145 (EP,US);
H01L33/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Leuchtdiodenanordnung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1999/17] | English: | Light-emitting diode device and method for fabricating the same | [1999/17] | French: | Dispositif à diode électroluminescente et sa méthode de fabrication | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |