EP0913627 - Mounting device for recessed apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lorentzen, Uwe-Jens Am Reesberg 18 32120 Hiddenhausen / DE | [1999/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Uwe Patentanwalt Holbeinstrasse 27 59423 Unna / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Schneider, Uwe Holbeinstrasse 27 59423 Unna / DE | Application number, filing date | 98120395.3 | 28.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | DE1997147467 | 28.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19747467 | [1999/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913627 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0913627 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/04 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
F21V21/02 (EP);
F21V21/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, LI, LU, NL [2001/39] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aufnahmevorrichtung für Einbauten | [1999/18] | English: | Mounting device for recessed apparatus | [1999/18] | French: | Dispositif de fixation pour appareils encastrés | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 01.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/45] | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2001 | 31.10.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2732375 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-6,8,10,11,20 * page 5, line 26 - line 30 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]FR2730354 (ALOMBARD SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,10,20 * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 32 * * page 9, line 29 - line 34 * * figures 1,2,3A,3B * [A] 14-16; | [X]US4760510 (LAHTI UOLEVI L [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,20 * column 3, line 36 - line 45 * * figures 1-5,7 * * column 4, line 62 - line 66 *; | [X]FR1452709 (HOUPLAIN) [X] 1,3-8,12,13,20 * page 2, column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 27 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2647139 (FMS [FR]) [A] 1,14-19 * page 7, line 11 - line 36 * * figure 3 * |